Մաթեմատիկա

ՏՆԱՅԻՆ ԱՇԽԱՏԱՆՔ

posted 14.12.2019

322.
234:6=39
744:8=93
1794:23=78
2997:37=81
9268:331=28
21333:547=39
323.
576×23-766×35=13248-26810=13248+(-26810)= -13562
849×18-783×28=15282-21924=15282+(-21924)= -6642
136×13-(8416+1234)=1768-9650=1768+(-9650)= -7882
4736:4-1245×5=1184-6225=1184+(-6225)= -5041
325.
400:(-8)= -50
(-420):(-10)= +42
(-60):15= -4
144:12= +12
326.
-20:5= -4
-50:10= -5
-80:(-20)= +4
-100:(-25)= +4
30:(-15)= -2
64:(-8)= -8
327.
200:(-40)= -5
-500:100= -5
720:(-90)= -8
-810:(-9)= +90
-560:(-70)= +8
-480:60= -8
328.
-711:9= -79
1332:(-3)= -444
-2316:(-12)= +193
-1302:42= -31
-2205:(-7)= +315
3208:(-8)= -401

Թողնել պատասխան

Fill in your details below or click an icon to log in:

WordPress.com Logo

You are commenting using your WordPress.com account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Google photo

You are commenting using your Google account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Twitter picture

You are commenting using your Twitter account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Facebook photo

You are commenting using your Facebook account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Connecting to %s